EP0253440 - Household laundry dryer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.1993 [1993/07] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Bauknecht Hausgeräte GmbH Am Wallgraben 99 70565 Stuttgart / DE | For:ES
FR
GB
IT
SE
WHIRLPOOL INTERNATIONAL B.V. Tarwelaan 58 5632 KG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For:DE
Bauknecht Hausgeräte GmbH Am Wallgraben 99 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
IT
SE
WHIRLPOOL INTERNATIONAL B.V. Tarwelaan 58 NL-5632 KG Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1989/21] | For:DE
Bauknecht Hausgeräte GmbH Am Wallgraben 99 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1988/03] | For:DE
Bauknecht Hausgeräte GmbH Am Wallgraben 99 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maier, Rolf Winterlingenweg 10 D-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | 02 /
Hohmann, Siegfried Bahnhofstrasse 33 D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Meier, Friedrich Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 Postfach 10 51 49 D-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Meier, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 Postfach 10 51 49 D-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE | ||
Former [1988/03] | Peuckert, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87201298.4 | 08.07.1987 | [1988/03] | Priority number, date | DE19863624050 | 16.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3624050 | [1988/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0253440 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0253440 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/26 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
D06F58/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/03] | Title | German: | Haushaltswäschetrockner | [1988/03] | English: | Household laundry dryer | [1988/03] | French: | Séchoir à linge domestique | [1988/03] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 23.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1422338 ; | [A]DE2559035 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US4207686 (DAILY THOMAS E [US]); | [A]FR2239653 (TI DOMESTIC APPLIANCES LTD [GB]); | [A]US4033047 (KAWAI TSUNEO); | [AD]DE8328232U |