EP0255165 - Weft straightening equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.03.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bianco, Mario Loc. Vaccheria, 7/2 I-12051 Alba (CN) / IT | [1988/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/05] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 87201317.2 | 11.07.1987 | [1988/05] | Priority number, date | IT19860067626 | 01.08.1986 Original published format: IT 6762686 | [1988/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0255165 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255165 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D06C3/02, D06H3/12 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
D06H3/12 (EP);
D06C3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/05] | Title | German: | Schussfadenrichtgerät | [1988/05] | English: | Weft straightening equipment | [1988/05] | French: | Redresseur de fils de trame | [1988/05] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 17.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.1992
08.09.1992
ADMISSIBLE Mahlo GmbH & Co. KG Donaustrasse 12 93342 Saal/Donau / DE Opponent's representative Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.1992
08.09.1992
ADMISSIBLE Mahlo GmbH & Co. KG Donaustrasse 12 93342 Saal/Donau / DE Opponent's representative Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.1992
08.09.1992
ADMISSIBLE Mahlo GmbH & Co. KG Donaustrasse 12 8424 SAAL/Donau / DE Opponent's representative Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr. Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 D-81633 München / DE | 18.09.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.01.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.01.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 20.12.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.11.1991 | BE | 21.11.1991 | FR | 21.11.1991 | NL | 21.11.1991 | SE | 21.11.1991 | ES | 22.02.1992 | GR | 22.02.1992 | GB | 11.07.1992 | CH | 31.07.1992 | LI | 31.07.1992 | LU | 31.07.1992 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 21.11.1991 | |
BE | 21.11.1991 | ||
FR | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
SE | 21.11.1991 | ||
ES | 22.02.1992 | ||
GB | 11.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [2004/35] | AT | 21.11.1991 | |
BE | 21.11.1991 | ||
FR | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
SE | 21.11.1991 | ||
GB | 11.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 21.11.1991 | |
BE | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
SE | 21.11.1991 | ||
FR | 10.04.1992 | ||
GB | 11.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 21.11.1991 | |
BE | 21.11.1991 | ||
CH | 21.11.1991 | ||
LI | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
SE | 21.11.1991 | ||
FR | 10.04.1992 | ||
GB | 11.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/47] | AT | 21.11.1991 | |
BE | 21.11.1991 | ||
CH | 21.11.1991 | ||
LI | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
SE | 21.11.1991 | ||
FR | 10.04.1992 | ||
GB | 11.07.1992 | ||
Former [1992/45] | AT | 21.11.1991 | |
BE | 21.11.1991 | ||
CH | 21.11.1991 | ||
LI | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
SE | 21.11.1991 | ||
FR | 10.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | AT | 21.11.1991 | |
BE | 21.11.1991 | ||
CH | 21.11.1991 | ||
LI | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
SE | 21.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/29] | AT | 21.11.1991 | |
CH | 21.11.1991 | ||
LI | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
SE | 21.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/27] | CH | 21.11.1991 | |
LI | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
SE | 21.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/26] | CH | 21.11.1991 | |
LI | 21.11.1991 | ||
SE | 21.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/24] | SE | 21.11.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1140893 (INTRON LEIPZIG WERK FUER IND E); | [A]DE1150041 (INTRON LEIPZIG VEB, et al); | [A]US3193688 (HUMPHREY MORTON, et al); | [A]FR1461597 (AMDES); | [A]US3402443 (LEITNER FRANK W, et al); | [A]US3751774 (HANNAWAY J); | [A]GB2036306 (MAHLO GMBH & CO KG); | [A]GB2062040 (TOYO MACHINERY CO); | [A]GB2134492 (TOYO MACHINERY CO) |