EP0255166 - Clamping device for clamping an optical disc onto a drive spindle, and disc-record player provided with said clamping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grobben, Henri Michiel c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/05] | Representative(s) | Schrijnemaekers, Hubert J.M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | Schrijnemaekers, Hubert Joannes Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87201331.3 | 14.07.1987 | [1988/05] | Priority number, date | NL19860001938 | 28.07.1986 Original published format: NL 8601938 | [1988/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0255166 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255166 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/028, G11B17/035 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
G11B17/0284 (EP,US);
G11B25/04 (KR);
G11B17/035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/05] | Title | German: | Klemmvorrichtung für das Festklemmen einer optischen Platte auf einer Antriebsspindel und Plattenspieler mit dieser Klemmvorrichtung | [1988/05] | English: | Clamping device for clamping an optical disc onto a drive spindle, and disc-record player provided with said clamping device | [1988/05] | French: | Dispositif de serrage pour serrer un disque optique sur un plateau d'entraînement et lecteur de disque comportant un tel dispositif de serrage | [1988/05] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/39] | 29.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 02.01.1992 | [1992/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4536867 (ROBINSON JOSEPH B [US]); | [A]FR2337397 (THOMSON BRANDT [FR]); | [A]FR2254086 (OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0130636 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]EP0128331 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [AD]GB2148579 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]DE2927502 (ROBOTRON VEB K); | [A]US4409629 (PULS NORMAN M [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 1, June 1979, pages 293-295, New York, US; K.D. RUSCH et al.: "Flexible disk drive having precise centering mechanism" |