EP0262704 - Aircraft cabin panel and insulation retainer with integrated use as a spacer-isolator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.01.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | ||
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707 Mail Stop 7E-25 Seattle Washington 98124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aquino, Roberto Cruz 17304 158th Avenue S.E. Renton, WA 98058 / US | 02 /
Kirk, Anthony Ivan Clifford 4513 165th St. S.E. Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | 03 /
Webb, Thomas Edward Anthony Henson 820 132nd Avenue N.E. Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | 04 /
Starling, John Christopher 18731 N.E. 55th St. Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 87201633.2 | 28.08.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | US19860913522 | 30.09.1986 Original published format: US 913522 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0262704 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0262704 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/12, B64C1/40, B61D17/18, B62D31/02, E05C19/00 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
B64C1/066 (EP,US);
B64C1/403 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/14] | B64C1/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/14] | Title | German: | Flugzeugkabinenabdeckung und Isolierstoffhalteteil, wirksam auch als Isolierzwischenstück | [1988/14] | English: | Aircraft cabin panel and insulation retainer with integrated use as a spacer-isolator | [1988/14] | French: | Panneau de cabine d'avion et pièce de retenue de l'isolant employée aussi comme entretoise d'isolement | [1988/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 04.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/09] | 15.10.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2912724 (WILKES WESLEY H); | [AD]US3460306 (SCHMIDLIN HANS); | [A]US4319528 (GUTRIDGE JACK E, et al); | [A]US4547016 (GABRIELIAN HENRY [US]) |