EP0263552 - Composite material for medical or paramedical, particularly orthopaedic use and method for manufacturing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ponnet, Tom Paul Marthe Ghislain Statiestraat 92 2600 Berchem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states Ponnet, Tom Paul Marthe Ghislain Statiestraat 92 B-2600 Berchem / BE | ||
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states Ponnet, Tom Paul Marthe Ghislain Lode Vissenaekenstraat 2 B-2600 Berchem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | Debrabandere, René, et al BUREAU DE RYCKER Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Belgie N.V. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Debrabandere, René, et al BUREAU DE RYCKER Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Belgie N.V. Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [1988/15] | Debrabandere, René BUREAU DE RYCKER Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Belgie N.V. Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 87201839.5 | 02.10.1987 | [1988/15] | Priority number, date | BE19862061067 | 08.10.1986 Original published format: BE 2061067 | BE19862061090 | 21.11.1986 Original published format: BE 2061090 | BE19862061130 | 19.12.1986 Original published format: BE 2061130 | [1988/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0263552 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0263552 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263552 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/36, A61L15/07, C08L67/04, C08L75/04 | [1988/15] | CPC: |
A61F13/04 (EP);
B32B27/065 (US);
A61L15/07 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/40 (US);
B32B5/18 (US);
C08L67/04 (EP);
A61B2017/00902 (EP);
B32B2266/0278 (US);
B32B2535/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08L75/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/15] | Title | German: | Verbundmaterial für medische oder paramedische, vorzugsweise orthopädische Anwendung, und Verfahren zur Herstellung davon | [1988/15] | English: | Composite material for medical or paramedical, particularly orthopaedic use and method for manufacturing it | [1988/15] | French: | Matériau composite pour usage médical ou paramédical, en particulier orthopédique et son procédé de production | [1988/15] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 11.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.03.1992 | GR | 18.03.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1993/03] | AT | 18.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3728206 (BUESE G); | [YD]EP0087329 (LHD LAB HYGIENE DIETETIQUE [FR]) |