EP0280795 - Method and apparatus for storing a digital data base divided into parcels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Driessen, Leonardus Maria Hendricus Emiel c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Janse, Cornelis Pieter c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Lahayhe, Paul Dominique Marie Etienne c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/36] | Representative(s) | Strijland, Wilfred, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | Strijland, Wilfred, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202016.9 | 20.10.1987 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | NL19860002654 | 23.10.1986 Original published format: NL 8602654 | [1988/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0280795 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0280795 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/40, G11B27/28, G01C21/00 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
G01C21/3881 (EP,US);
G06F16/29 (EP,US);
G06F16/532 (EP,US);
G06F16/902 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
G11B2220/255 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99945 (US);
Y10S707/99948 (US);
Y10S707/99953 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Speicherung einer haufenweise unterteilten Binaerdatenbasis | [1988/36] | English: | Method and apparatus for storing a digital data base divided into parcels | [1988/36] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour l'archivage d'une base de données binaires subdivisée en lots | [1988/36] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 13.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.10.1992 | LI | 07.10.1992 | [1993/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59068617 ; | [Y]US3597745 (LAHRSON ALLAN E, et al) | [YD] - COMPUTER VISION, GRAPHICS AND IMAGE PROCESSING, vol. 26, no. 3, June 1986, pages 303-318, Academic Press, Inc., New York, US; TAKASHI MATSUYAMA et al.: "A file organization for geographic information systems based on spatial proximity" | [A] - COMPUTER VISION, GRAPHICS AND IMAGE PROCESSING, vol. 30, no. 1, April 1985, pages 56-69, Academic Press, Inc., New York, US; J.P. LAUZON et al.: "Two-dimensional run-encoding for quadtree representation" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 175 (P-294)[1612], 11th August 1984; & JP-A-59 068 617 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 18-04-1984, & JP59068617 A 00000000 | [AP] - OPTICA '87, The International Meeting for Optical Publishing and Storage, Amsterdam, 14th-16th April 1987, pages 286-294, Learned Information, Oxford, GB; K. Hoffman et al.: "Logical data formats for CD-ROMS-description, valuation and implementation" |