EP0268314 - Device for determining the flow velocity of a medium in a cylindrical pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SERVEX B.V. Bessemerstraat 21 NL-3301 CB Dordrecht / NL | [1988/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drenthen, Jan Gert Ravenswey 42 NL-3261 VB Oud-Beijerland / NL | [1988/21] | Representative(s) | Timmers, Cornelis Herman Johannes, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | Timmers, Cornelis Herman Johannes, et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202028.4 | 21.10.1987 | [1988/21] | Priority number, date | NL19860002690 | 27.10.1986 Original published format: NL 8602690 | [1988/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0268314 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268314 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66 | [1988/21] | CPC: |
G01F1/662 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Durchflussgeschwindigkeit einer Mediums in einem zylindrischen Rohr | [1988/21] | English: | Device for determining the flow velocity of a medium in a cylindrical pipe | [1988/21] | French: | Dispositif pour déterminer la vitesse de courant d'une substance dans une conduite cylindrique | [1988/21] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/25] | 18.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.12.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 06.03.1991 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1200349 (TOKYO KEIKI SEIZOSHO COMPANY L [JP]); | [Y]DE2552072 (NAT RES DEV); | [YD]US4103551 (LYNNWORTH LAWRENCE C) |