EP0266013 - Device for pressing cheeses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P & F Hubert Industries CV Postbus 59 8600 AB Sneek / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states P & F Hubert Industries CV Postbus 59 NL-8600 AB Sneek / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reinders, Eize Aggemastate 25 NL-8926 PA Leeuwarden / NL | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, et al Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, Ir., et al Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202075.5 | 28.10.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | NL19860002714 | 29.10.1986 Original published format: NL 8602714 | [1988/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266013 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266013 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01J25/15 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
A01J25/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Pressen von Käse | [1988/18] | English: | Device for pressing cheeses | [1988/18] | French: | Dispositif de pressage pour fromage | [1988/18] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/43] | 30.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL6608096 ; | [A]NL7602421 (GASBJERG KNUD); | [A]DE1782644 ; | [A]NL8104030 ; | [A]US3317999 (ROYER KENNETH W, et al); | [A]NL7613772 (HOLVRIEKA INTERNATIONAL BV) |