EP0266838 - A switch-over valve, preferably for an air drier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garphyttan Haldex AB Box 501 S-261 24 Landskrona / SE | [1988/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nelander, Ake Sävsangarevägen 14 S-230 44 Vintrie / SE | 02 /
Övall, Lars Blamesvägen 14 S-240 21 Löddeköpinge / SE | [1988/19] | Representative(s) | Petri, Stellan c/o SAB NIFE AB Box 515 261 24 Landskrona / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | Petri, Stellan c/o SAB NIFE AB Box 515 S-261 24 Landskrona / SE | Application number, filing date | 87202094.6 | 30.10.1987 | [1988/19] | Priority number, date | SE19860004687 | 03.11.1986 Original published format: SE 8604687 | [1988/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266838 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266838 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266838 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, B60T17/00, F16K11/044 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
F16K11/044 (EP,US);
B01D53/261 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2685 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/19] | B01D53/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/19] | Title | German: | Umschaltventil, vorzugsweise für einen Lufttrockner | [1988/19] | English: | A switch-over valve, preferably for an air drier | [1988/19] | French: | Soupape d'inversion, préférablement pour un sécheur d'air | [1988/19] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 26.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.04.1991 | BE | 24.04.1991 | CH | 24.04.1991 | IT | 24.04.1991 | LI | 24.04.1991 | NL | 24.04.1991 | ES | 04.08.1991 | GB | 30.10.1991 | [2007/52] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 24.04.1991 | |
BE | 24.04.1991 | ||
CH | 24.04.1991 | ||
IT | 24.04.1991 | ||
LI | 24.04.1991 | ||
NL | 24.04.1991 | ||
ES | 04.08.1991 | ||
GB | 30.10.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 24.04.1991 | |
BE | 24.04.1991 | ||
CH | 24.04.1991 | ||
IT | 24.04.1991 | ||
LI | 24.04.1991 | ||
NL | 24.04.1991 | ||
GB | 30.10.1991 | ||
Former [1993/13] | AT | 24.04.1991 | |
BE | 24.04.1991 | ||
CH | 24.04.1991 | ||
LI | 24.04.1991 | ||
NL | 24.04.1991 | ||
GB | 30.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/18] | AT | 24.04.1991 | |
BE | 24.04.1991 | ||
CH | 24.04.1991 | ||
LI | 24.04.1991 | ||
NL | 24.04.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | AT | 24.04.1991 | |
CH | 24.04.1991 | ||
LI | 24.04.1991 | ||
NL | 24.04.1991 | ||
Former [1992/02] | CH | 24.04.1991 | |
LI | 24.04.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2715936 (GEMOC GEORGE MOSKHALIS & CO KG); | [A]US4512781 (CARALLI MICHAEL J [US], et al) |