EP0270165 - Movable accomodation or container in which is arranged apparatus for automatic milking of an animal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.06.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROLION B.V. Kromme Spieringweg 289B 2141 BS Vijfhuizen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | For all designated states PROLION B.V. Kromme Spieringweg 289B NL-2141 BS Vijfhuizen / NL | ||
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states PROLION B.V. Sikkelstraat 53 NL-2151 CP Nieuw-Vennep / NL | ||
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states Multinorm B.V. Hoofdweg 1278 NL-2153 LR Nieuw-Vennep / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verbrugge, Jeroen Klaas Jan Hugo Van Rijkenlaan 8 NL-2612 JR Delft / NL | 02 /
Aurik, Erik Arnoldus Sint Willibrordusstraat 48II NL-1073 VC Amsterdam / NL | [1988/23] | Representative(s) | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202238.9 | 16.11.1987 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | NL19860002942 | 19.11.1986 Original published format: NL 8602942 | [1988/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0270165 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/12 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
A01J5/0175 (EP,US);
A01J5/0138 (EP,US);
A01K1/123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/23] | Title | German: | Ortsbeweglicher Raum oder Container, der ein Gerät zum automatischen Melken von Tieren enthält | [1988/23] | English: | Movable accomodation or container in which is arranged apparatus for automatic milking of an animal | [1988/23] | French: | Local ou conteneur amovible contenant de l'appareillage pour la traite automatique d'animaux | [1988/23] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/19: Teilanmeldung 91200484.3 eingereicht am 16/11/87 | EPB 1991/19: Divisional application 91200484.3 filed on 16/11/87 | EPB 1991/19: Demande divisionnaire 91200484.3 déposée le 16/11/87 | Examination procedure | 15.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 12.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.1990 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/32] | 20.03.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/32] | Divisional application(s) | EP91200484.3 / EP0432148 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3019763 (FERRIS ROBERT G); | [XD]EP0091892 | [AD] - LANDTECHNIK, vol. 41, no. 7/8, July/August 1986, pages 328-330, Lehrte, DE; W. WEBER: "Neuheiten zur Milchgewinnung und -Lagerung" | by applicant | US3019763 | EP0189954 | EP0213660 | EP0232568 | - W. WEBER, "Neuheiten zur Milchgewinnung und-lagerung", LANDTECHNIK, (1986), vol. 41, no. 7,8 |