EP0269183 - A soil cultivating machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van der Lely, Cornelis 7, Brüschenrain Zug / CH | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202280.1 | 20.11.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | NL19860002972 | 24.11.1986 Original published format: NL 8602972 | [1988/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269183 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269183 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01B33/08, A01B33/06 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
A01B33/065 (EP);
A01B33/085 (EP);
A01B49/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/22] | Title | German: | Bodenbearbeitungsmaschine | [1988/22] | English: | A soil cultivating machine | [1988/22] | French: | Machine pour le travail du sol | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 26.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3971445 ; | [Y]FR86726E ; | [A]GB619713 ; | [A]GB1220199 ; | [A]GB1547718 | Examination | GB853796 |