EP0277375 - Window stay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STENMAN HOLLAND B.V. Energiestraat 2, P.O. Box 47 3903 AV Veenendaal / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states STENMAN HOLLAND B.V. Energiestraat 2 P.O. Box 47 NL-3903 AV Veenendaal / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leurink, Adolf Albertus Tweespan 46 NL-3902 GH Veenendaal / NL | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Timmers, Cornelis Herman Johannes, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Timmers, Cornelis Herman Johannes, et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202284.3 | 20.11.1987 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | NL19870000065 | 13.01.1987 Original published format: NL 8700065 | [1988/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277375 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277375 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/32 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
E05C17/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/32] | Title | German: | Fensteraussteller | [1988/32] | English: | Window stay | [1988/32] | French: | Dispositif d'arrêt de fenêtres | [1988/32] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/35] | 16.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.02.1991 | GR | 27.02.1991 | [2000/04] |
Former [1991/49] | AT | 27.02.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL7405631 (HERPEN FREDERIK CORNELIS VAN) |