EP0273505 - High-pressure gas discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogels, Anthonius Bernardus Paulus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Marks, Peter Lambertus Franciscus Jacques c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Rooda, Hans, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | Rooda, Hans, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202458.3 | 09.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | NL19860003165 | 12.12.1986 Original published format: NL 8603165 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0273505 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273505 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/073 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
H01J61/073 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/27] | Title | German: | Hochdruckgasentladungslampe | [1988/27] | English: | High-pressure gas discharge lamp | [1988/27] | French: | Lampe à décharge à gaz à haute pression | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3170081 (FERDINAND ROKOSZ); | [A]DE3036666 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]); | [A]EP0193714 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |