EP0273512 - Stabilised adjuvant suspension comprising dimethyl dioctadecyl ammonium bromide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUPHAR INTERNATIONAL RESEARCH B.V C.J. van Houtenlaan 36 1381 CP Weesp / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states DUPHAR INTERNATIONAL RESEARCH B.V C.J. van Houtenlaan 36 NL-1381 CP Weesp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilgers, Lucas Alfonsus Theodorus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU ZOAN B.V. P.O. Box 140 NL-1380 AC Weesp / NL | 02 /
Weststrate, Marinus Wijnand c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU ZOAN B.V. P.O. Box 140 NL-1380 AC Weesp / NL | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Muis, M., et al OCTROOIBUREAU ZOAN B.V. P.O. Box 140 1380 AC Weesp / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | Muis, Maarten, et al OCTROOIBUREAU ZOAN B.V. P.O. Box 140 NL-1380 AC Weesp / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202523.4 | 15.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | NL19860003232 | 19.12.1986 Original published format: NL 8603232 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273512 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273512 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273512 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/00, A61K39/39, A61K47/18 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55511 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/27] | A61K47/00, A61K39/39 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/27] | Title | German: | Dimethyldioctadecylammoniumbromid enthaltende stabilisierte Adjuvanssuspension | [1988/27] | English: | Stabilised adjuvant suspension comprising dimethyl dioctadecyl ammonium bromide | [1988/27] | French: | Suspension adjuvante stabilisée comprenant du bromure de diméthyl dioctadécyl ammonium | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 21.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3919411 (GLASS MAX E, et al) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, 1979, page 456, abstract no. 20667j, Columbus, Ohio, US; J. CHIBA et al.: "Adjuvant effect of cationic surface-active lipid, dimethyl dioctadecyl ammonium bromide, on the induction of delayed-type hypersensitivity to sheep red blood cells in mice", & Jpn. J. Med. Sci. Biol. 1978, 31(4), 361-4 |