EP0229702 - Nozzle seal retaining assembly and positioning assembly therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rylatt, John Anthony 2363 Haymaker Road Monroeville PA 15146 / US | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300207.5 | 09.01.1987 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | US19860817363 | 09.01.1986 Original published format: US 817363 | [1987/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229702 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229702 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F22B37/22, F16L55/10 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
F22B37/222 (EP,US);
F16L55/10 (EP,US);
Y10T292/202 (EP,US);
Y10T292/216 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Festhalten einer Stutzenabdichtung und Positioniereinrichtung dazu | [1987/30] | English: | Nozzle seal retaining assembly and positioning assembly therefor | [1987/30] | French: | Dispositif de retenue pour fermeture de buse et son positionnement | [1987/30] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 06.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/44] | 08.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2545971 (THOME JEAN PATRICK [FR]); | [A]FR2562310 (FIELD AUTOMATION SARL [FR]) |