EP0242011 - A toy car with a parachute [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.1990 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINSEI KOGYO CO., LTD. No. 2-27-23, Sumida Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [1987/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagano, Toshiaki SHINSEI KOGYO CO., LTD. No. 4-2-20, Omochanomachi Mibu-machi Shimotsuga-gun, Tochigi / JP | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [1987/43] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK Suite 301 Sunlight House Quay Street Manchester M3 3JY / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300239.8 | 12.01.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | JP19860085641 | 14.04.1986 Original published format: JP 8564186 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0242011 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0242011 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/20 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
A63H17/26 (EP,US);
A63H33/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/43] | Title | German: | Spielzeugauto mit Fallschirm | [1987/43] | English: | A toy car with a parachute | [1987/43] | French: | Voiture-jouet avec parachute | [1987/43] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 30.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/29] | 09.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4008541 (RUSSER MARTIN R); | [A]GB2151146 (PLATT CYRIL JOHN CASWELL) |