EP0235884 - Omnidirectional antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Butcher, Miles Edward Jordans, Playford Road Little Bealings Woodbridge Suffolk, IP13 6ND / GB | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | Buttrick, Richard, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | [2009/47] |
Former [1992/13] | Buttrick, Richard, et al British Telecommunications plc Intellectual Property Department 13th FLoor 151 Gower Street London WC1E 6BA / GB | ||
Former [1987/37] | Lloyd, Barry George William Intellectual Property Unit British Telecom Room 1304 151 Gower Street London WC1E 6BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300270.3 | 13.01.1987 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | GB19860002246 | 30.01.1986 Original published format: GB 8602246 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0235884 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235884 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q19/10 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
H01Q17/001 (EP,US);
H01Q19/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/37] | Title | German: | Rundstrahlantenne | [1987/37] | English: | Omnidirectional antenna | [1987/37] | French: | Antenne omnidirectionnelle | [1987/37] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 18.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.09.1992 | BE | 02.09.1992 | CH | 02.09.1992 | GR | 02.09.1992 | LI | 02.09.1992 | NL | 02.09.1992 | SE | 02.09.1992 | ES | 13.12.1992 | LU | 31.01.1993 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 02.09.1992 | |
BE | 02.09.1992 | ||
CH | 02.09.1992 | ||
GR | 02.09.1992 | ||
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
LU | 31.01.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 02.09.1992 | |
BE | 02.09.1992 | ||
CH | 02.09.1992 | ||
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | BE | 02.09.1992 | |
CH | 02.09.1992 | ||
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | CH | 02.09.1992 | |
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | CH | 02.09.1992 | |
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | CH | 02.09.1992 | |
LI | 02.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR1392013 ; | [AD]GB1126670 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ); | [A]DE1801706 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ); | [YD]DE1907696 (DEUTSCHE BUNDESPOST); | [Y]DE1801707 (RHODE & SCHWARZ); | [A]US3887926 (SCHWARTZ LEONARD, et al); | [Y]US4014027 (REINDERS MICHIEL ANTONIUS) |