EP0232024 - Room temperature-curable organopolysiloxane composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.1989 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. Asahitokai Bldg. 6-1 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. Asahitokai Bldg. 6-1 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takago, Toshio 94-7, yanase Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Okami, Takehide 10-28, Isobe 3-chome Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Yasushi 992-4, yawato-cho Takasaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamaguchi, Koichi 1-12-22, yachiyo-cho Takasaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300325.5 | 15.01.1987 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | JP19860008556 | 18.01.1986 Original published format: JP 855686 | [1987/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0232024 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0232024 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/06, C09D3/82, C09J3/16, C09K3/10, C09K3/18, D06M15/643, B29C33/64 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
C08K5/57 (EP);
C08K5/54 (EP);
C08G77/16 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/54, C08L83/04 (EP);
C08K5/57, C08L83/04 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08L2666/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/33] | Title | German: | Bei Raumtemperatur härtbare Organopolysiloxanzusammensetzung | [1987/33] | English: | Room temperature-curable organopolysiloxane composition | [1987/33] | French: | Composition d'organopolysiloxane durcissable à température ambiante | [1987/33] | File destroyed: | 16.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/47] | 28.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.05.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2146863 ; | [A]DE2335569 |