EP0233700 - Moulding Fibre Reinforced Composite Armour [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Composite Components Limited Delves Road Heanor Gate Industrial Estate Heanor Derbyshire DE7 7SJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | For all designated states Advanced Composite Components Limited Delves Road Heanor Gate Industrial Estate Heanor Derbyshire DE7 7SJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sloman, Roger Mark Advanced Composite Comp. Ltd. Delves Road Heanor Gate Industrial Estate Heanor Derbyshire DE7 7SJ / GB | [1987/35] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Iain Angus, et al Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [1987/35] | Application number, filing date | 87300356.0 | 16.01.1987 | [1987/35] | Priority number, date | GB19860001166 | 17.01.1986 Original published format: GB 8601166 | [1987/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0233700 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0233700 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B29C63/02, B29C63/16 | [1987/35] | CPC: |
B29C33/0016 (EP);
B29C43/02 (KR);
B29C63/02 (EP);
B29C63/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/35] | Title | German: | Formen einer mit Fasern verstärkter Verbundarmierung | [1987/35] | English: | Moulding Fibre Reinforced Composite Armour | [1987/35] | French: | Moulage d'une armature composite renforcée par des fibres | [1987/35] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/45] | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0076673 (ADVANCED COMPOSITE COMPONENTS [GB]); | [X]EP0148534 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A]US3861977 (WILEY NATHANIEL C); | [A]DE1629682 (TECIMAR SOC POUR L ANVANCEMENT); | [A]EP0170819 (AUDI AG [DE]) |