EP0232039 - Method of recording images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LIMITED P.O. Box 102, Wedgwood Way Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 4QN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LIMITED P.O. Box 102, Wedgwood Way Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 4QN / GB | ||
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LIMITED De La Rue House 3/5 Burlington Gardens London W1A 1DL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clinton, Geoffrey David 2 Greenways Abbots Langley Hertfordshire / GB | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300413.9 | 19.01.1987 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | GB19860001300 | 20.01.1986 Original published format: GB 8601300 | [1987/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232039 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232039 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/387 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
H04N1/387 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1987/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bildaufzeichnung | [1987/33] | English: | Method of recording images | [1987/33] | French: | Procédé d'enregistrement d'images | [1987/33] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 17.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1900881 (KRONEN GABY); | [A]DE1652340 (HELL RUDOLF DR ING FA); | [A]US3639056 (GERSON ALBERT); | [A]GB2066507 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG, et al); | [A]DE3230719 (BUECHLER LESTER W) | [A] - SIEMENS-ZEITSCHRIFT, vol. 47, no. 10, October 1973, pages 741-746, Erlangen, DE; A. COLDITZ: "Prinzip und Leistungsmerkmale des digital-elektronischen Lichtsetzsystems DIGISET" | [A] - MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 1, no. 2, October 1983, pages 121-142, Amsterdam, NL; T. TAKIGAWA et al.: "High voltage electron beam lithography" |