EP0232046 - Copying machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 08.03.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kazuyuki, Ohnishi No. 213 East Coop 1 Higashijyoto-cho Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Masakiyo, Okuda 273 Hondo Kashiwara-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Yoshiteru, Mori 2-17-3 Tengajyaya Nishinari-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300433.7 | 19.01.1987 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | JP19860009401 | 18.01.1986 Original published format: JP 940186 | [1987/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0232046 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0232046 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232046 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, G03G15/052 | [1988/28] | CPC: |
G03G15/50 (EP,US);
G03G15/041 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/33] | G03G15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/33] | Title | German: | Kopiergerät | [1987/33] | English: | Copying machine | [1987/33] | French: | Appareil à copier | [1987/33] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 22.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.1993
14.05.1993
ADMISSIBLE Canon Inc. No. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP Opponent's representative Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2009/48] |
Former [1993/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.1993
14.05.1993
ADMISSIBLE Canon Inc. No. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP Opponent's representative Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | 28.05.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.09.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.05.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/17] | 18.05.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.06.1994 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.06.1994 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60123872 ; | DE3421255 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]); | US4129377 [ ] (MIYAMOTO KOICHI, et al); | DE3517086 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]); | DE3006881 [ ] (HEIDE HANS VON DER [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 281 (P-403) [2004], 8th November 1985; & JP - A - 60 123 872 (CANON) 02-07-85, & JP60123872 A 00000000 | Examination | DE3606881 | JPS60182432 |