EP0231098 - Molded non-asbestos friction member and a process for producing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYMARK INDUSTRIES, INC. 123 East Stiegel Street Manheim Pennsylvania 17545 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states RAYMARK INDUSTRIES, INC. 123 East Stiegel Street Manheim Pennsylvania 17545 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Royer, James R. 289 Marietta Avenue Mount Joy Pennsylvania / US | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Hale, Stephen Geoffrey, et al Bromhead Johnson 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | Hale, Stephen Geoffrey, et al J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14/18 High Holborn London WC1V 6DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300516.9 | 21.01.1987 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | US19860821397 | 22.01.1986 Original published format: US 821397 | [1994/49] |
Former [1987/32] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0231098 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0231098 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0231098 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/02 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
F16D69/026 (EP,US);
Y10T442/608 (EP,US);
Y10T442/697 (EP,US);
Y10T442/699 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/32] | Title | German: | Geformtes asbestfreies Reibungselement und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1987/32] | English: | Molded non-asbestos friction member and a process for producing it | [1987/32] | French: | Elément de friction moulé exempt d'amiante et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1987/32] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 08.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.04.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.08.1994 | DE | 04.11.1994 | GB | 21.01.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/04] | DE | 04.11.1994 | |
FR | 30.12.1994 | ||
GB | 21.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/28] | DE | 04.11.1994 | |
FR | 30.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | DE | 04.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2016027 (JOHNS MANVILLE); | [Y]EP0129022 (BORG WARNER [US]) |