EP0235901 - Solutions and their use in carbonless paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.1989 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOCH INDUSTRIES, INC. 4111 E. 37th North Wichita Kansas / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states KOCH INDUSTRIES, INC. 4111 E. 37th North Wichita Kansas / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komin, Andrew Pentland 5400 E. 21st Street Apt. 503 Wichita Kansas 67208 / US | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300559.9 | 22.01.1987 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | US19860821983 | 23.01.1986 Original published format: US 821983 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0235901 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/12 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
B41M5/1655 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/37] | Title | German: | Lösungen und ihre Verwendung in Papier ohne Kohle | [1987/37] | English: | Solutions and their use in carbonless paper | [1987/37] | French: | Solutions et leur utilisation dans le papier sans carbone | [1987/37] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/43] | 04.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/03] | 18.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2177020 (BASF AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0167900 (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) |