EP0232142 - Pressure transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deseret Medical, Inc. 9450 South State Street Sandy Utah 84070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states Deseret Medical, Inc. 9450 South State Street Sandy Utah 84070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanlon, Stephen Paul 10045 So. Ridge Gate Circle Sandy Utah 84092 / US | 02 /
Kerby, Walter Lynn 1623 Casper Road Sandy Utah 84092 / US | 03 /
Purdy, Edmund Robert 1102 East Raymond Road Fruitheights Utah 84037 / US | 04 /
Strom, James 2216 Atkins Avenue Salt Lake City Utah 84109 / US | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Jones, Michael Raymond, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | Jones, Michael Raymond, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300823.9 | 30.01.1987 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | US19860826056 | 04.02.1986 Original published format: US 826056 | [1987/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0232142 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0232142 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232142 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/06, G01L19/14 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
A61B5/0215 (EP,US);
G01L19/0084 (EP,US);
G01L19/142 (EP,US);
G01L19/143 (EP,US);
G01L19/147 (EP,US);
G01L9/0002 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0247 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/33] | Title | German: | Druckwandler | [1987/33] | English: | Pressure transducer | [1987/33] | French: | Transducteur de pression | [1987/33] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 04.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.11.1992 | LI | 11.11.1992 | NL | 11.11.1992 | SE | 11.11.1992 | [1993/26] |
Former [1993/23] | CH | 11.11.1992 | |
LI | 11.11.1992 | ||
NL | 11.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | CH | 11.11.1992 | |
LI | 11.11.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0124308 (AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP [US]) | [Y] - MACHINE DESIGN, vol. 56, August 1984, no. 19, Cleveland, Ohio, US, page 60; "Throw-away chip monitors blood pressure" | [Y] - WESCON PROCEEDINGS SAN FRANSISCO, 19th-22nd November 1985, 29 (1985) November, New York, US, pager 2714, pages 1-5; R. FRANK: "An update on the integration of silicon pressure sensors" | [A] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, vol. 33, April 1985, no. 9, Hasbrouck Heights, New Jersey, US, pages 193-196, 198; R. FRANK: " One-element transducer brings uniform traits to IC pressure sensors" |