EP0244055 - Method of sequencing peptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO-AFFINITY SYSTEMS, INC. 363 Van Ness Way Suite 403 Torrance California 90501 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states BIO-AFFINITY SYSTEMS, INC. 363 Van Ness Way Suite 403 Torrance California 90501 / US | ||
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states ANALYTICHEM INTERNATIONAL, INC. 24201 Frampton Avenue Harbor City California 90710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stolowitz, Mark L. 406 Shea Lane Long Beach California 90803 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [1987/45] | 01 /
Stolowitz, Mark L. 406 Shea Lane Long Beach California 90803 / US | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301008.6 | 05.02.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | US19860857738 | 28.04.1986 Original published format: US 857738 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0244055 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0244055 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, // G01N33/483 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
G01N33/6824 (EP,US);
Y10T436/255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Aminosäuresequenz von Peptiden | [1987/45] | English: | Method of sequencing peptides | [1987/45] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer la séquence d'acides amines des peptides | [1987/45] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 01.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/45] | 09.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3725010 (PENHASI H) | [X] - TRENDS IN ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 2, no. 12, December 1983, pages 267-269, CambridgeGB; D.G. KLAPPER: "Trends in automated protein sequence analysis" | [A] - METHODS OF BIOCHEMICAL ANALYSIS, vol. 26, 1980, pages 202-284, New YorkUS; R.A. LAURSEN: "Solid-Phase methods in protein sequence analysis" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 1, 2nd July 1984, page 283, column 1, abstract no. 3222p, Columbus, OhioUS; P.D.G. DEAN et al.: "Applications of immobilised boronic acids"; & AFFINITY CHROMATOGR. BIOL. RECOGNIT: ÄProd. Int. Symp.Ü 1983 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 7, page 258, column 2, abstract no. 50771f; Columbus, Ohio, US; C. HANSSON et al.: "Chromatographic separation of catecholic amino acids and catecholamines on immobilized phenylboronic acid", & J. CHROMATOGR. 1978, 161559-563 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 5, 31st January 1977, page 395, column 1, abstract no. 30048q, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.I. TESSER et al.: " An expedient to solid phase Edman degradation. Synthesis and properties of 4-isothiocyanato benzoyl-DL-homoserine lactone", & J. PEPT. PROTEIN RES. 1976, 8(6)559-563 |