EP0238189 - Verapamil dosage form [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1991 [1991/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 950 Page Mill Road P.O. Box 10950 Palo Alto California 94303-0802 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states ALZA CORPORATION 950 Page Mill Road P.O. Box 10950 Palo Alto California 94303-0802 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stephens, Sally I. 580 E. William Street San Jose California 95112 / US | 02 /
Magruder, Paul 2762 Byron Street Palo Alto California 94306 / US | 03 /
Wong, Patrick S.-L. 1371 Xavier Avenue Hayward California 94545 / US | 04 /
Hamel, Larry G. 755 Ramona Avenue Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | [1987/39] | Representative(s) | Evans, David Charles, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | Evans, David Charles, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301155.5 | 10.02.1987 | [1987/39] | Priority number, date | US19860841144 | 19.03.1986 Original published format: US 841144 | [1987/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0238189 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0238189 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/22 | [1987/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/275 (EP,KR,US);
A61M31/00 (KR);
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/39] | Title | German: | Verpamil in Dosierungskapsel | [1987/39] | English: | Verapamil dosage form | [1987/39] | French: | Verapamil en capsule de diffusion | [1987/39] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 17.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0040899 (ALZA CORP [US]); | [Y]GB2150830 (ALZA CORP); | [A]EP0169105 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) |