EP0234824 - Locking device for articles such as sailboards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTION DESIGN CREATIONS INC. P.O. Box 359 Hudson, Quebec J0P 1H0 / CA | [1990/19] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states Stewart, Leo James 123 Pine Avenue P.O. Box 359 Hudson Quebec J0P 1H0 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stewart, Leo James 123 Pine Avenue P.O. Box 359 Hudson Quebec JOP 1HO / CA | [1990/20] |
Former [1987/36] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Ralph Fitzpatricks Cardinal Court 23, Thomas More Street London E1 9YY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | Atkinson, Ralph Fitzpatricks Cardinal Court 23, Thomas More Street London E1 9YY / GB | ||
Former [1989/52] | Atkinson, Ralph Fitzpatricks Cardinal Court 23, Thomas More Street London E1 9YY / GB | ||
Former [1989/05] | Woodin, Anthony John Fitzpatricks Europe House Box No. 88 World Trade Centre East Smithfield London E1 9AA / GB | ||
Former [1987/36] | Woodin, Anthony John Fitzpatricks Europe House Box No. 88 World Trade Center East Smithfield London E1 9AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301294.2 | 16.02.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | CA19860502520 | 24.02.1986 Original published format: CA 502520 | [1987/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0234824 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0234824 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234824 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05B73/00 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
E05B73/007 (EP,US);
E05B67/383 (EP,US);
E05B73/0005 (EP,US);
Y10T70/40 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1987/36] | Title | German: | Verriegelungsvorrichtung für Gegenstände, zum Beispiel für Surfbretter | [1987/36] | English: | Locking device for articles such as sailboards | [1987/36] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage pour objets tels que planche à voile | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 06.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB560054 (OLOF JONSSON LOFQWIST); | [A]US4340376 (WILLIAMS WARREN S) |