EP0240126 - Multipack for flanged containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Mead Corporation Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaussadas, Jean 71 Rue des Glycines Brassioux F-36130 Deols / FR | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301427.8 | 19.02.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | GB19860004411 | 21.02.1986 Original published format: GB 8604411 | [1987/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0240126 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0240126 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
B65D5/20 (KR);
B65D71/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/41] | Title | German: | Sammelverpackung für Behälter mit Flansch | [1987/41] | English: | Multipack for flanged containers | [1987/41] | French: | Emballage de groupement pour récipients à bourrelet | [1987/41] | File destroyed: | 27.02.1995 | Examination procedure | 13.04.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/02] | 07.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.05.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB984450 (PRINT PROCESSES SALES LTD); | [X]FR1444157 (PARISIENNE IMPRESSION); | [A]US4304329 (GRASER EARL J) |