EP0234875 - Photocatalytic treatment of water for the preparation of extrapure water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOMURA MICRO SCIENCE CO., LTD. 2-9-8, Okada Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states NOMURA MICRO SCIENCE CO., LTD. 1-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Tomoji 16-1-615, Onohara Minoo-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Ohta, Yoshiharu 15-2 Hiratsuka 4-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Satoh, Hisao 7-13 Wakamatsu 4-chome Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Moon, Donald Keith, et al BREWER & SON Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | [1990/34] |
Former [1987/36] | Field, Roger Norton Brewer & Son Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301453.4 | 19.02.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | JP19860033843 | 20.02.1986 Original published format: JP 3384386 | [1987/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0234875 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0234875 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234875 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/30, C02F1/32, C02F1/72 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
C02F1/32 (EP,US);
Y10S210/90 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/36] | C02F1/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1987/36] | Title | German: | Aufbereitung superreinen Wassers mittels Fotokatalyse | [1987/36] | English: | Photocatalytic treatment of water for the preparation of extrapure water | [1987/36] | French: | Préparation de l'eau ultrapure par traitement photocatalytique | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/05] | 31.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4571290 (WARD MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [A]FR2116640 (ANVAR); | [A]DE3405217 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | Examination | DE2729760 | EP0306301 |