EP0236078 - Lockable safety-pins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEWEY GOODMAN LIMITED Sedgley Road West Tipton West Midlands DY4 8AH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states NEWEY GOODMAN LIMITED Sedgley Road West Tipton West Midlands DY4 8AH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Millar, Robert Gregor "Wares Warren" Stratford Road Wootton Wawen Nr. Henley in Arden Warwicks. B95 6DG / GB | 02 /
Horne, Martin John 77B High Street Kinver Worcestershire / GB | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | Wallbank, Roger Wickham, et al BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | Wallbank, Roger Wickham, et al BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301715.6 | 26.02.1987 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | GB19860005133 | 01.03.1986 Original published format: GB 8605133 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0236078 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0236078 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0236078 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A44B9/12 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
A44B9/12 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4645 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1990/44] |
Former [1987/37] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Sicherheitsnadel mit Verschlusselement | [1987/37] | English: | Lockable safety-pins | [1987/37] | French: | Epingle de sûreté verrouillable | [1987/37] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 23.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB217353 (WILLIAM STEELE YOUNG); | [A]US2668996 (JAKOB KUMMLI); | [AD]GB793060 (GEORGE GOODMAN LTD); | [Y]GB885963 (ILSE FRICKE TURNER, et al); | [X]GB2087711 (NEWEY GOODMAN LTD) |