EP0236080 - Laser Beam printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Higashi-ku Osaka 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Higashi-ku Osaka 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horihata, Katsushi Fuji-Haitsu 202-go 7-27-12, Toyosato Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka / JP | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301719.8 | 26.02.1987 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | JP19860044999 | 28.02.1986 Original published format: JP 4499986 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0236080 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0236080 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0236080 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/32, // G02B26/08 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
H04N1/1135 (EP,US);
G02B27/0018 (EP,US);
G06K15/12 (EP,US);
H04N1/036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/37] | Title | German: | Laserstrahldrucker | [1987/37] | English: | Laser Beam printer | [1987/37] | French: | Imprimeur à rayons laser | [1987/37] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 07.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1216140 [ ] (BAYER AG [US]); | US4132477 [ ] (WATABE ROKURO, et al); | US4342050 [ ] (TRAINO JAMES C); | US4469430 [ ] (TERASHIMA ISAMU [JP]) |