EP0237239 - New compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road P.O. Box 129 London NW1 2BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road London NW1 2BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allan, Geoffrey The Wellcome Foundation Limited Langley Court Beckenham Kent / GB | 02 /
Hardy, George William The Wellcome Foundation Limited Langley Court Beckenham Kent / GB | 03 /
Bull, Donald The Wellcome Foundation Limited Langley Court Beckenham Kent / GB | 04 /
O'Callaghan, John Mark The Wellcome Foundation Limited Temple Hill Dartford Kent / GB | 05 /
Lee, Grahame Roy The Wellcome Foundation Limited Temple Hill Dartford Kent / GB | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Garrett, Michael, et al Glaxo Wellcome plc, Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Garrett, Michael, et al The Wellcome Foundation Limited Group Patents and Agreements Langley Court Beckenham Kent BR3 3BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301739.6 | 27.02.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | GB19860005048 | 28.02.1986 Original published format: GB 8605048 | GB19870000945 | 16.01.1987 Original published format: GB 8700945 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0237239 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0237239 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, A61K37/64 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
C07K5/0222 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Verbindungen | [1987/38] | English: | New compounds | [1987/38] | French: | Composés | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 03.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/10] | 08.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3705907 (TROXLER FRANZ); | [YD]EP0012401 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [XP]EP0174162 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) |