EP0237261 - Silicon nitride sintered bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1991 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1991 [1991/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsui, Minori 93 Yashirodai 1-chome Meito-Ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301879.0 | 04.03.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | JP19860047410 | 06.03.1986 Original published format: JP 4741086 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0237261 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0237261 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237261 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/58 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
C04B35/584 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Gesinterte Siliciumnitridkörper | [1987/38] | English: | Silicon nitride sintered bodies | [1987/38] | French: | Corps frittés en nitrure de silicium | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 05.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY BULLETIN, vol. 62, no. 12, December 1983, pages 1369-1374, Columbus, Ohio, US; F.F. LANGE "Fabrication and properties of dense polyphase silicon nitride" | [A] - AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY BULLETIN, vol. 59, no. 2, February 1980, pages 239, 240, 249, Columbus, Ohio, US; F.F. LANGE "Si3N4-Ce203-Si02 materials: Phase relations and strength" | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, vol. 68, no. 7, July 1985, pages 413-418, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.K. GOVILA et al.: "Fracture of Yttria-doped, sintered reaction-bonded silicon nitride" | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, vol. 63, no. 1-2, January-February 1980, pages 35-37, Columbus, Ohio, US; L.J. GAUCKLER et al.: "The System Si3N4-Si02-Y203" | [A] - JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, vol. 20, no. 10, October 1985, pages 3545-3556, London, GB; L.K.L. FALK et al.: "Development of microstructure during the fabrication of Si3N4 by nitridation and pressureless sintering of Si:Si3N4 compacts" |