EP0239285 - Metering dispensers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cope Allman Plastics Limited Walton Road Farlington Portsmouth Hampshire, PO6 1TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states Cope Allman Plastics Limited Walton Road Farlington Portsmouth Hampshire, PO6 1TS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wortley, Michael John 94 Charlesworth Drive Waterlooville Hampshire / GB | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Duncan, Angus Henry, et al Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | Duncan, Angus Henry, et al Barker, Brettell & Duncan 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 87302081.2 | 11.03.1987 | [1987/40] | Priority number, date | GB19860006051 | 12.03.1986 Original published format: GB 8606051 | [1987/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0239285 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0239285 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01F11/28 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
G01F11/286 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/40] | Title | German: | Dosierspender | [1987/40] | English: | Metering dispensers | [1987/40] | French: | Distributeurs doseurs | [1987/40] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 18.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 04.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1075967 ; | [AD]GB2146973 |