EP0238257 - Integrated calling directory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1987/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourg, James Warren 7 Borden Street Monmouth Beach New Jersey 07750 / US | 02 /
Tierney, Thomas John, Jr. 12370 East LaSalle Place Aurora Colorado 80014 / US | [1987/39] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | ||
Former [1987/39] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87302106.7 | 11.03.1987 | [1987/39] | Priority number, date | US19860842682 | 21.03.1986 Original published format: US 842682 | [1987/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0238257 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0238257 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0238257 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/50, H04Q11/04, H04Q3/545 | [1987/39] | CPC: |
H04M3/4931 (EP,US);
H04M1/27 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0428 (EP,US);
Y10S379/904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/39] | Title | German: | Integrierter Rufnummernauskunftgeber | [1987/39] | English: | Integrated calling directory | [1987/39] | French: | Annuaire d'appel intégré | [1987/39] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 16.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3231835 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [YD]WO8501855 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]DE3044642 (MERK GMBH TELEFONBAU FRIED [DE]); | [XP]WO8602219 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]WO8102824 (ZELEX CORP [US]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM; Florence, 7th-11th May 1984, part 1, session 22 C paper 3, pages 1-5, North-Holland, Amsterdam, NL; N.X. DELESSIO et al.: "An integrated opterator services capability for the 5ESS system" |