EP0239385 - Radiation-sensitive positive resist and composition containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kataoka, Mutsuo 4-20, Beppo 2 Ohtsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | 02 /
Tokunaga, Aguto Toray Hokuenryo 13-1, Sonoyama 2 Ohtsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | [1993/21] |
Former [1987/40] | 01 /
Kataoka, Mutsuo 4-20, Beppo 2 Ohtsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Tokunaga, Atuto Toray Hokuenryo 13-1, Sonoyama 2 Ohtsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1987/40] | Ellis, John Clifford Holgate MEWBURN ELLIS & CO. 2/3 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87302576.1 | 25.03.1987 | [1987/40] | Priority number, date | JP19860065898 | 26.03.1986 Original published format: JP 6589886 | [1987/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0239385 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0239385 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0239385 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/039 | [1993/21] | CPC: |
G03F7/039 (EP,US);
Y10S430/143 (EP,US);
Y10S430/167 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/40] | G03F7/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/40] | Title | German: | Strahlungsempfindlicher Positivlack und Zusammensetzung | [1987/40] | English: | Radiation-sensitive positive resist and composition containing the same | [1987/40] | French: | Réserve positive sensible aux rayonnements et composition | [1987/40] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 28.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Request for further processing for: | 26.01.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.02.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57176040 ; | [YD]US4259407 (TADA TSUKASA, et al); | [Y]EP0064222 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 14, 2nd April 1984, page 574, abstract no. 112341B, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-57 176 040 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 29-10-1982, & 11th COLLECTIVE INDEX CHEMICAL SUBSTANCES, page 56180CS, tetra fluoropropylester, homopolymer, & JP57176040 A 00000000 |