EP0240265 - Dies for extrusion-shaping ceramic honeycomb structural bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | For all designated states INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY PRECISION ELECTRICAL DISCHARGE WORKS 283 Shimohirama Saiwai-ku Kawasaki shi Kanagawa 211-0953 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | ||
For all designated states INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY PRECISION ELECTRICAL DISCHARGE WORKS 283 Shimohirama Saiwai-ku Kawasaki City, Kanagawa Prefecture / JP | |||
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | ||
For all designated states INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY PRECISION ELECTRICAL DISCHARGE WORKS 283 Shimohirama Saiwai-ku Kawasaki City Kanagawa Prefecture / JP | |||
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467 / JP | ||
For all designated states INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY PRECISION ELECTRICAL DISCHARGE WORKS 283 Shimohirama Saiwai-ku Kawasaki City Kanagawa Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozaki, Sei 12-8 Minamigoaka 1-chome Nisshin-Cho Aichi-Gun Aichi-Pref. / JP | 02 /
Futamura, Shoji Institute of Technology Precision Electr. Discharge Works 283 Shimohirama Saiwa-ku Kawasaki City Kanagawa-Pref. / JP | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 87302669.4 | 27.03.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | JP19860071500 | 29.03.1986 Original published format: JP 7150086 | [1987/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0240265 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0240265 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0240265 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B28B3/26 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
B28B3/269 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/41] | Title | German: | Matrize zum Extrudieren von keramischen Gegenständen in Honigwabenstruktur | [1987/41] | English: | Dies for extrusion-shaping ceramic honeycomb structural bodies | [1987/41] | French: | Filière pour mouler par extrusion des corps céramiques à structure en nid d'abeilles | [1987/41] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 03.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3283616 (BALCENIK EDWARD G, et al); | [Y]US4373895 (YAMAMOTO SHINICHI [JP], et al); | [YD]US4118456 (BLANDING WENDELL S, et al); | [Y]EP0143555 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al); | [YD]EP0017686 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0083850 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]); | [A]US2195314 (MARK LINCOLN) |