EP0241198 - Composite material with light matrix metal and with reinforcing fiber material being short fiber material mixed with potassium titanate whiskers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubo, Masahiro Toyota Jidosha Kubushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Dohnomoto, Tadashi Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Atsuo Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Hirai, Hidetoshi Toyota Automatic Loom Works Ltd. 2-1 Toyodacho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87302753.6 | 31.03.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | JP19860083750 | 11.04.1986 Original published format: JP 8375086 | [1987/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241198 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241198 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/09 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
C22C49/14 (EP,US);
C22C49/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12486 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/42] | Title | German: | Verbundwerkstoff, bestehend aus einer Leichtmetallmatrix und einer Faserinnenbewehrung aus einer Mischung von kurzen Fasern und Kaliumtitanatwhiskern | [1987/42] | English: | Composite material with light matrix metal and with reinforcing fiber material being short fiber material mixed with potassium titanate whiskers | [1987/42] | French: | Matériau composite avec une matrice métallique en alliage léger et un matériau de renforcement constitué d'un mélange de fibres courtes et de whiskers de titanate de potassium | [1987/42] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 01.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5966966 ; | [A]JP5966967 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 12, 17th September 1984, page 314, abstract no. 96183q, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 66 966 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO., LTD) 16-04-1984, & JP5966966 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 12, 17th September 1984, page 314, abstract no. 96184r, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 66 967 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO., LTD) 16-04-1984, & JP5966967 A 00000000 |