EP0240311 - Fuel-injection control system for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.12.1992 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wataya, Seiji c/o Himeji Seisakusho of Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 840, Chiyoda-cho Himeji City Hyogo Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Kishimoto, Yuji c/o Himeji Seisakusho of Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 840, Chiyoda-cho Himeji City Hyogo Prefecture / JP | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Lawson, David Glynne, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [1987/41] | Application number, filing date | 87302790.8 | 31.03.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | JP19860076140 | 31.03.1986 Original published format: JP 7614086 | [1987/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0240311 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0240311 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/22, F02D41/26, F02D33/02 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
F02D41/222 (EP,US);
F02D41/22 (KR);
F02D41/182 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/41] | Title | German: | Brennstoffeinspritzsteuerungssystem für Verbrennungsmotoren | [1987/41] | English: | Fuel-injection control system for an internal combustion engine | [1987/41] | French: | Système de commande d'injection de carburant pour moteur à combustion interne | [1987/41] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/29] | 13.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 03.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/06] | 01.06.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/06] | Appeal following examination | 24.07.1990 | Appeal received No. T0622/92 | 26.09.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.11.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 25.11.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.12.1992 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP61058945 ; | [A]JP59231147 ; | [Y]GB2094507 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]US4348996 (MOROZUMI TAKURO); | [Y]US4245608 (TAMAKI SIGEO, et al) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 222 (M-504)[2278], 2nd August 1986; & JP-A-61 058 945 (NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD) 26-03-1986 (Cat. A), & JP61058945 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 111 (M-379)[1834], 15th May 1985; & JP-A-59 231 147 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 25-12-1984, & JP59231147 A 00000000 |