EP0241233 - Method for determining the fouling tendency of hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 1900 East Linden Avenue Linden New Jersey 07036-0710 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 1900 East Linden Avenue Linden, New Jersey 07036-0710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dickakian, Ghazi Basher 1911 Pleasant Creek Drive Kingwood Texas 77345 / US | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Collier, Jeremy Austin Grey, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1989/18] |
Former [1987/42] | Northover, Robert Frank Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 87302902.9 | 02.04.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | US19860849600 | 08.04.1986 Original published format: US 849600 | [1987/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241233 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241233 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241233 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/28 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/2805 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/42] | G01N33/22 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Beschmutzungs-Tendenz von Kohlenwasserstoffen | [1987/42] | English: | Method for determining the fouling tendency of hydrocarbons | [1987/42] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer la tendance à s'encrasser des hydrocarbures | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 26.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]USB26330I ; | [A]GB2018425 (ELF UNION); | [A]US4341634 (MATSUSHITA SUSUMU, et al) | [A] - J. CHROMATOGR. SCI., vol. 21, no. 7, 1983, pages 331-333; M.-A. POIRIER et al.: "Rapid method for the determination of malthene and asphaltene content in bitumen, heavy oils, and synthetic fuels by pyrolysis TLC" |