EP0240363 - Error correction methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sako, Yoichiro c/o Patent Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87302935.9 | 03.04.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | JP19860077696 | 04.04.1986 Original published format: JP 7769686 | [1987/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0240363 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0240363 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0240363 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00, G11B20/18, // G11B20/12 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
H03M13/1515 (EP,US);
G06F11/22 (KR);
G11B20/1252 (EP,US);
G11B20/1809 (EP,US);
H03M13/2909 (EP,US);
H03M13/293 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2525 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/41] | Title | German: | Fehlerkorrekturverfahren | [1987/41] | English: | Error correction methods | [1987/41] | French: | Méthode de correction d'erreurs | [1987/41] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 18.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4336612 (INOUE TORU, et al); | [A]FR2545298 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0136604 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0140381 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3523249 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) | [A] - CONFERENCE RECORD 1978 NATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, Birmingham, Alabama, 3rd-6th December 1978, vol. 2, pages 20.6.1 - 20.6.5, IEEE, New York, US; T. INOUE et al.: "A new class of burst-error-correcting codes and it's application to PCM tape recording systems" | [A] - ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, vol. 64, no. 5, May 1981, pages 20-30, Scripta Publishing Co., Silver Spring, Maryland, US; M. OHKUBO et al.: "On interleaved codes for error-correcting codes" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, vol. CE-31, no. 3, August 1985, pages 386-396, IEEE, New York, US; S. MITA et al.: "Digital video recording techniques using 1/2 inch metal particle tape" | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, vol. 30, no. 12, December 1982, pages 889-895, Audio Engineering Society Inc., New York, US; W.J. VAN GESTEL et al.: "A multitrack digital audio recorder for consumer applications" |