EP0242169 - Divinyl compounds and chromogenic recording material prepared by use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMADA CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1-1 Kamitoba-Kamichoshicho Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states YAMADA CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1-1 Kamitoba-Kamichoshicho Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Hajime 3-12-12 Osumigaoka Tanabe-cho Tsuzuki-gun Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Fujino, Yoshiharu 3-14-23 Osumigaoka Tanabe-cho Tsuzuki-gun Kyoto-fu / JP | 03 /
Shimizu, Youji 54 Daigo-Kakiharacho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 04 /
Nieda, Seiichi 205 Rumieru-Nishikyogoku 6-Nishikyogoku-Suehiro-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 05 /
Gendai, Kazuhiko 6-1-1106 Mukaijima-Danchi 14-8 Mukaijima-Yotsuyaike Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 06 /
Tsunemitsu, Katsuhiko 30-3 Daigo-Takahatacho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 87303230.4 | 13.04.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | JP19860087619 | 15.04.1986 Original published format: JP 8761986 | JP19870023361 | 02.02.1987 Original published format: JP 2336187 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0242169 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0242169 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0242169 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/88, C07D405/14, C07D405/06, C07D471/04, B41M5/00, // (C07D471/04, 221:00, 221:00) | [1992/01] | CPC: |
C07D455/04 (EP,US);
B41M5/145 (EP,US);
B41M5/327 (EP,US);
C07D307/88 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/42] | C07D307/88, C07D405/14, C07D405/06, C07D471/04, B41M5/22, B41M5/18, B41M5/12, // (C07D471/04, 221:00, 221:00) | ||
Former IPC [1987/43] | C07D307/88, C07D405/14, C07D471/04, B41M5/18, // (C07D471/04, 221:00, 221:00) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/43] | Title | German: | Divinylverbindungen und unter Verwendung dieser Verbindungen hergestelltes chromogenes Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [1987/43] | English: | Divinyl compounds and chromogenic recording material prepared by use thereof | [1987/43] | French: | Composés divinyliques et matière chromogène d'enregistrement préparée en utilisant ces composés | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/05] | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60027589 ; | [A]JP60008364 ; | [AP]JP61202883 ; | [A]EP0062544 (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0188377 (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2614944 (NCR CO); | [A]DE2218895 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, no. 22, 3rd June 1985, page 684, abstract no. 195296f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-60 027 589, & JP60027589 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, no. 26, 1st July 1985, page 589, abstract no. 229544c, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-60 008 364, & JP60008364 A 00000000 | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACT, vol. 107, no. 6, 10th August 1987, page 663, abstract no. 49640a, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-61 202 883, & JP61202883 A 00000000 |