EP0243122 - Piperazine compound as PAF-antagonist [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.1990 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 3, Doshomachi 4-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 3, Doshomachi 4-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimazaki, Norihiko New Life Umezono Daiichi No.602 Sakuramura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Hemmi, Keiji No. 2-17-1, Umezono Sakuramura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakaguti, Osamu No. 15-34, Nakasakurazuka 1-chome Toyonaka / JP | 04 /
Miyazaki, Yoshio No. 1-13, Hiramatsu 2-chome Itami / JP | 05 /
Hashimoto, Masashi Kashiwa Mansion No.212 No. 2-11-6, Takezono Sakuramura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | [2007/32] |
Former [1987/44] | 01 /
Shimazaki, Norihiko New Life Umezono Daiichi No.602 Sakuramura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Hemmi, Keiji No. 2-17-1, Umezono Sakuramura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Nakaguti, Osamu No. 15-34, Nakasakurazuka 1-chome Toyonaka / JP | |||
04 /
Miyazaki, Yoshio No. 1-13, Hiramatsu 2-chome Itami / JP | |||
05 /
Hashimoto, Masashi Kashiwa Mansion No.212 No. 2-11-6, Takezono Sakuramura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87303419.3 | 16.04.1987 | [1987/44] | Priority number, date | GB19860009908 | 23.04.1986 Original published format: GB 8609908 | GB19860031082 | 31.12.1986 Original published format: GB 8631082 | [1987/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0243122 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0243122 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D417/14, C07D241/08, A61K31/495, // C07K5/06, C07D209/20 | [1988/28] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP);
C07D241/08 (EP,KR);
C07D417/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/44] | C07D401/12, C07D417/12, C07D241/08, A61K31/495, // C07K5/06, C07D209/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/44] | Title | German: | Piperazinverbindungen als Hemmer des blutplättchenaktivierenden Faktors | [1987/44] | English: | Piperazine compound as PAF-antagonist | [1987/44] | French: | Composés du pipérazine comme antagonistes du facteur activant les plaquettes sanguines | [1987/44] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 22.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 17.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/01] | 03.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59013779 ; | [XP]EP0181152 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]); | [Y]GB1600127 (WELLCOME FOUND) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 29, 1984, page 603, column 2, abstract no. 209873q, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 013 779 (JPN. KOKAI TOKKYO KOHO) 24-01-1984, & JP59013779 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 34, 1977, page 453, column 1, abstract no. 16936w, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.P. HOPE et al.: "The application of ketimine derivatives of amino acids to peptide synthesis", & AUST. J. CHEM. 1976, 29(7), 1591-1603 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 96, no. 34, 1982, column 2, abstract no. 218218f, Columbus, Ohio, US; C.D. TRAN et al.: "Ground and excited state conformational differences between diastereomeric dipeptides", & J. AM. CHEM. SOC. 1982, 104(11), 3002-3007 | [A] - DIE PHARMAZIE, vol. 32, no. 1, January 1977, pages 1-16, Berlin; S. JOHNE et al.: "Naturstoffe mit Diketopiperazinstruktur" |