EP0244260 - Method and system for multiplex transmission of an audio signal and a video signal through a communication cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwamura, Soichi 2-21-26 Honmachi Fuchu-shi Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Murakami, Satoshi 5-731-4 Matsugaoka Nagareyama-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Itsumi, Tadashi 3-32 Asahimachi 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [1987/45] | Brown, Kenneth Richard R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87303916.8 | 30.04.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | JP19860100185 | 30.04.1986 Original published format: JP 10018586 | JP19860100187 | 30.04.1986 Original published format: JP 10018786 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0244260 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0244260 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0244260 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0244260 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/10, H04N7/18 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
H04N7/10 (EP,US);
H04N7/148 (EP,US);
H04N7/186 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/45] | H04N7/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System für Multiplexübertragung eines Audiosignals und eines Videosignals über ein Kommunikationskabel | [1987/45] | English: | Method and system for multiplex transmission of an audio signal and a video signal through a communication cable | [1987/45] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la transmission multiplexée de signaux audio et vidéo par un câble de communication | [1987/45] | Examination procedure | 30.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 22.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3492418 (TANNER DE LOSS J); | [A]GB1425341 (COMMUNICATIONS PATENTS LTD); | [A]EP0157460 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al); | [A]GB1524183 (COMMUNICATIONS PATENTS LTD) | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, vol. 58, no. 7, July 1970, pages 1016-1023; R.P. GABRIEL: "Dial a programm - an HF remote selection cable television system" |