EP0246033 - Swinging gate mounting and swing actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bailey, Thomas R. 3728 Southwest Three Tree Point Lane Seattle Washington 98166 / US | For all designated states Bailey, William J. 3730 Southwest 171st Street Seattle Washington 98166 / US | For all designated states Ransom, James B. 1906 Bigelow Avenue North No. 402 Seattle Washington 98109 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | For all designated states Bailey, Thomas R. 3728 Southwest Three Tree Point Lane Seattle Washington 98166 / US | ||
For all designated states Bailey, William J. 3730 Southwest 171st Street Seattle Washington 98166 / US | |||
For all designated states Ransom, James B. 1906 Bigelow Avenue North No. 402 Seattle Washington 98109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hall, Richard C. 5301 Southcenter Blvd. Seattle, Washington 98188 / US | [1987/47] | Representative(s) | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87304088.5 | 07.05.1987 | [1987/47] | Priority number, date | US19860861833 | 12.05.1986 Original published format: US 861833 | [1987/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0246033 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0246033 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/12 | [1987/47] | CPC: |
E05F1/066 (EP,US);
E05F15/614 (EP,US);
E05F15/00 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/614 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/822 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/83 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/106 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/40 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18984 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/47] | Title | German: | Schwenktüraufhängung und Betätigungsvorrichtung | [1987/47] | English: | Swinging gate mounting and swing actuator | [1987/47] | French: | Suspension pour porte pivotante et dispositif d'actionnement | [1987/47] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 16.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/08] | 14.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1493072 ; | [A]GB1534291 (DUNLOP LTD); | [Y]FR2485075 (FAIVRE ROBERT [FR]); | [X]DE3121136 (MAGNETIC ELEKTROMOTOREN GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE3219192 (UNTERREITER ERICH); | [A]CH651103 (BUCHENBERG KONRAD) |