EP0247789 - Gas constituent measurement and recording [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The BOC Group, Inc. 85 Chestnut Ridge Road Montvale, New Jersey 07645 / US | [1987/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auerbach, Abraham 28 Dover Terrace Monsey New York 10952 / US | 02 /
Friedman, Sonia 109 Fieldboro Drive Lawrenceville New Jersey 08648 / US | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Gough, Peter, et al c/o THE BOC GROUP PLC Patent Department Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | Gough, Peter, et al c/o THE BOC GROUP PLC Patent Department Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87304506.6 | 20.05.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | US19860886810 | 27.05.1986 Original published format: US 886810 | [1987/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0247789 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0247789 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/22, G01N21/77, G01N31/10, G01N33/00 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
G01N21/783 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1987/49] | Title | German: | Messung und Aufzeichnung eines Gasbestandteils | [1987/49] | English: | Gas constituent measurement and recording | [1987/49] | French: | Mesure et enregistrement d'un constituant de gaz | [1987/49] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/38] | 23.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.02.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0120231 ; | [X]FR2068049 ; | [A]EP0120203 ; | FR855571 [ ] |