EP0247816 - Heat-sensitive microcapsular colour recording material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usami, Toshimasa Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. Oonakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka 418 / JP | 02 /
Hatakeyama, Seiji Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. Oonakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka 418 / JP | 03 /
Shimomura, Akihiro Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. Oonakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka 418 / JP | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Diamond, Bryan Clive, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [1987/49] | Application number, filing date | 87304617.1 | 22.05.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | JP19860121875 | 26.05.1986 Original published format: JP 12187586 | JP19860292160 | 08.12.1986 Original published format: JP 29216086 | JP19870088197 | 09.04.1987 Original published format: JP 8819787 | [1987/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0247816 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0247816 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247816 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
B41M5/3375 (EP,US);
B41M5/3275 (EP,US);
B41M5/3335 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1987/49] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliches Farbe-Aufzeichnungsmaterial mit Mikrokapseln | [1987/49] | English: | Heat-sensitive microcapsular colour recording material | [1987/49] | French: | Matériel thermosensible pour l'enregistrement en couleurs contenant des microcapsules | [1987/49] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 09.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 04.01.1993 | Appeal received | 01.03.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.04.1993 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2929736 (MILLER ROBERT E, et al); | [Y]DE2153634 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]FR2120873 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [Y]FR2148237 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [Y]EP0016366 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0024897 (MONSANTO EUROPE SA [BE]); | [A]WO8404730 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2158958 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]EP0171039 (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) |