EP0261760 - Composite moulded article and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHELLER GLOBE CORPORATION 4444 North Detroit Avenue Toledo Ohio 43612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states SHELLER GLOBE CORPORATION 4444 North Detroit Avenue Toledo Ohio 43612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanok, John Leo 28594 Chatam Grosse Ile Michigan 48138 / US | 02 /
Piechura, Michael Louis 19978 Fleming Detroit Michigan, 48234 / US | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Williams, Trevor John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | [1988/13] | Application number, filing date | 87304828.4 | 01.06.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | US19860911499 | 25.09.1986 Original published format: US 911499 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261760 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261760 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261760 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/16, B29C45/14, B29C67/22, B60R13/02 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
B29C45/1418 (EP,US);
B29C33/0044 (EP,US);
B29C45/1635 (EP,US);
B29C45/1671 (EP,US);
B29C70/68 (EP,US);
B60R21/0428 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14286 (EP,US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,US);
B29C67/247 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3005 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3041 (EP,US);
B60R13/02 (EP,US);
B60R13/0243 (EP,US);
Y10S264/83 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/13] | B29C45/14, B29C45/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/13] | Title | German: | Zusammengesetzter Formkörper und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1988/13] | English: | Composite moulded article and method of making same | [1988/13] | French: | Article moulé composite et son procédé de fabrication | [1988/13] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 26.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JPS62108019 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK); | [Y]DE3507522 (EBERS & MUELLER FIBRIT [DE]); | [Y]US3612783 (SCHNEIDER KUNO); | [Y]FR2094092 (CROMPTON PLASTICS LTD); | [Y]US4075266 (THEYSOHN FRIEDRICH); | [A]FR1121128 (APPLIC MATIERES PLASTIQUES); | [A]DE3233675 (KISS G H) | Examination | - SAE Technical Paper Series 820423 "RIM Urethanel Vinyl Composites as Interior Trim Parts" |