EP0249389 - Disk reading/writing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cocco, Vincent L. 2 Jennifer Road Wakefield MA 01880 / US | [1987/51] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87304909.2 | 03.06.1987 | [1987/51] | Priority number, date | US19860874003 | 13.06.1986 Original published format: US 874003 | [1987/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0249389 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0249389 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249389 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/04, G11B31/00 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
G11B17/041 (EP,US);
G11B31/006 (EP,US);
Y10S358/906 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/46] | G11B33/00 | ||
Former IPC [1987/51] | G11B31/00, G11B17/028, H04N5/76 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/51] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Plattenaufnahme und -wiedergabe | [1987/51] | English: | Disk reading/writing apparatus | [1987/51] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction de disques | [1987/51] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 20.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4262301 (ERLICHMAN IRVING); | [A]EP0135969 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]EP0070557 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |