EP0274180 - Detersive systems with a dispersed aqueous organic softening agent for hardness removal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul, MN 55102-2233 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul MN 55102-2233 / US | ||
Former [1988/28] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center Saint Paul Minnesota 55102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lokkesmoe, Keith D. 13008 Welcome Lane Burnsville Minnesota 55337 / US | 02 /
Olson, Keith Edward 13592 Eveleth Court Apple Valley Minnesota 55124 / US | [1988/28] | Representative(s) | Bond, Bentley George, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | Bond, Bentley George, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87304974.6 | 04.06.1987 | [1988/28] | Priority number, date | US19870001397 | 08.01.1987 Original published format: US 1397 | [1988/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0274180 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0274180 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274180 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D3/36, C11D3/20 | [1988/28] | CPC: |
C11D17/0017 (EP,US);
C11D1/40 (KR);
C11D3/2082 (EP,US);
C11D3/361 (EP,US);
C11D3/362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/28] | Title | German: | Reinigungssysteme mit einem in wässerig-organischem Milieu dispergierten Weichmacher zur Härteentfernung | [1988/28] | English: | Detersive systems with a dispersed aqueous organic softening agent for hardness removal | [1988/28] | French: | Systèmes détersifs avec un adoucisseur dispersé en milieu aqueux-organique pour l'élimination de la dureté | [1988/28] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3637488 (LI NORMAN N, et al); | [A]FR2338990 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [A]FR2345187 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) | [A] - Journal of Inorganic Nuclear Chemistry vol. 39, 1977, London & E.Horwitz: "The Mechanism of Interfacial Mass Transfert of Calcium in the System:Di(2-Ethylhexyl)Phosphoric Acid in Dodecane-Dilute Nitric Acid" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 07, 19 August 1985 Columbus, Ohio, USA Reusch, Rosetta Natoli: "A Mecanism for Phosphoglyceride and Calcium Ion Transbilayer Movement" page 223; ref. no. 50051 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, no. 20, 20 May 1985 Columbus, Ohio, USA & Xenakis A.: "Use of Microemulsions as Liquid Membranes. Improved Kinetics of Solute Transfer at Interfaces" page 413; ref. no. 173027 | Examination | - Journal of Inorganic Nuclear Chemistry vol. 39, 1977, London, pp. 1425-1432; G. Vandergrift & E. Horwitz: "The Mechanism of Interfacial Mass Transfert of Calcium in the System: D1(2-Ethylhexyl)Phosphoric Acid in Dodecane-Dilute Nitric Acid" |